Trustees THE UNITED WORLD COLLEGE OF THE ATLANTIC LIMITED

Charity number: 525761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ffion Thomas Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Lucy Kate Hodgson Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Cynthia Iyabo Oshuan Ogbonna Trustee 03 April 2023
None on record
Philip Martin Harman Brown Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
PETER LAWSON AGAR Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Ann Jones Trustee 30 August 2019
None on record
Ruth Rawling Trustee 18 March 2019
KING GEORGE'S FIELD ST DONAT'S ATLANTIC COLLEGE
Received: On time
Lutfey Siddiqi Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
JILL LONGSON Trustee 04 February 2018
None on record
Driek Desmet Trustee 20 July 2017
THE UNITED WORLD COLLEGES (INTERNATIONAL)
Received: On time
Ian Stuart Cooper Trustee 20 July 2017
ROYAL OSTEOPOROSIS SOCIETY
Received: On time
LADY JOANNA KNATCHBULL Trustee 09 January 2017
WESTMINSTER ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHILD AND FAMILY PRACTICE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time