ST MARY'S COLLEGE TRUST

Charity number: 525787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Iwan Rhun Davies Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
The Rt Revd Andrew John Trustee
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR Received: On time
CHURCH HOSTEL Overdue by 972 days
HOMES OF BISHOP ROWLANDS Received: On time
Venerable John Lomas Trustee 14 May 2015
THE WREXHAM (PAROCHIAL) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
STRODE AND JEFFREYS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WREXHAM AND DISTRICT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: 12 days late
Anest Gray Frazer Trustee 19 May 2019 None on record
ALLAN FRANK CAREY WILCOX Trustee None on record
Professor Andrew Christopher Edwards Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
LUCY HUSKINSON Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
LYNN BARTLETT Trustee 16 November 2016 None on record
The Very Reverend Kathy Jones Trustee 10 April 2018 None on record
John Carl Hughes Trustee 18 March 2019
THE SHARLAND CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Overdue by 1003 days
The Right Reverend GREGORY KENNETH CAMERON Chair
THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
CYTUN:EGLWYSI YNGHYD YNG NGHYMRU / CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WALES LIMITED Received: On time
BRIDGET BEVAN'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORTH WALES INTERNATIONAL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED/GWYL GERDD GOGLEDD CYMRU CYFYNGEDIG Received: On time
POWIS EXHIBITION FUND Received: On time
ROSALIND SUZANNE WILLIAMS Trustee 15 November 2016
THE ARCHBISHOP RICE JONES CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 1087 days
Dr Peter Shapely Trustee 01 December 2020
THE CHETHAM SOCIETY FOR THE PUBLICATION OF REMAINS HISTORICAL AND LITERARY CONNECTED WITH THE PALATINE COUNTIES OF LANCASTER AND CHESTER Overdue by 88 days
HISTORIC SOCIETY OF LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE Received: On time