LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 525868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £2.40k £2.45k £2.54k £2.09k £3.36k
Total expenditure £6.15k £1.05k £275 £2.14k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A