Accounts and annual returns HARRIS FREE PUBLIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 526078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required