Financial history HARRIS FREE PUBLIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 526078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.18k £17.62k £20.68k £21.04k £14.83k
Total expenditure £10.54k £1.86k £2.51k £2.09k £2.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A