NATIONAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 526223
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required