ELLEL ST. JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 526238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.97k £8.25k £8.58k £8.98k £8.93k
Total expenditure £2.55k £3.87k £4.84k £4.92k £4.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A