ROPER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526428
Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download