ROPER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526428
Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £50.40k £65.81k £65.78k £65.68k £65.42k
Total expenditure £44.43k £44.33k £57.05k £61.69k £65.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0