CROXTETH C P SCHOOL J M WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 526456
Charity reporting is overdue by 812 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £16.15k £5.21k £6.92k £4.32k £2.33k
Total expenditure £15.07k £2.31k £4.36k £4.09k £2.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A