Accounts and annual returns THE WINWICK EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 November 2023 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 February 2023 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 February 2022 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required