Financial history THE WINWICK EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526499
Charity reporting is overdue by 65 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.65k £2.58k £2.76k £2.62k £2.49k
Total expenditure £9.04k £6.60k £2.10k £4.95k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A