WADE DEACON HIGH SCHOOL AND WIDNES SIXTH FORM COLLEGE PRIZE FUND

Charity Number: 526755
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005

Total income: £1,112
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Halton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1989: Standard registration
  • 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005
Total gross income £1.04k £1.11k
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 05 May 2006 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL D P R ON 10 SEPTEMBER 1964 AND SCHEMES OF 9 MAY 1979 AND 30 JANUARY 1989 (DATE OF REGISTRATION RECORDED AS GD 30/01/89 AS ALSO MAIN CHARITY)
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY AND ANY SURPLUS INCOME TO BE USED FOR GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE WADE DEACON COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL OR OF WIDNES SIXTH FORM COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 30 January 1989 : Standard registration
  • 27 August 2009 : Removed