Accounts and annual returns MELMERBY CHURCH SCHOOL

Charity number: 526805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2020 11 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2018 28 February 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2017 06 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2016 12 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2016 Not Required