Financial history MELMERBY CHURCH SCHOOL

Charity number: 526805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/12/2016 20/12/2017 20/12/2018 20/12/2019 20/12/2020
Total gross income £400 £500 £500 £500 £500
Total expenditure £250 £0 £600 £300 £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A