Accounts and annual returns LONGCAKE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required