Accounts and annual returns MICHAEL HOUSE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 527187
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020
Annual return 31 August 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019
Annual return 31 August 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 July 2018 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2018 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window