BELMONT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 527206
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.21k £8.76k £9.12k £10.00k £11.00k
Total expenditure £16.08k £5.01k £5.00k £5.39k £11.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A