IAN RAMSEY SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 527380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 July 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required