Accounts and annual returns ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW

Charity number: 527408
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window