THE FOUNDATION OF THOMAS HODGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help financially young people in higher education/starting a profession or trade
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 April 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEIL TOWNSHEND | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Florence Elizabeth Anne Phillips MBE | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ELIZABETH ANN EYRE | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||
ANTONY ARTHUR LEIGH HOLMES | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
KEVIN BEASLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £1.81k | £1.85k | £1.87k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £2.45k | £2.00k | £1.60k | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 JANUARY 1951 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS TENABLE AT ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, ALOS BURSARIES AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE FOR CHILDRED RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH CHILDRED ON THEIR ENTERING A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALING. AWARD TO SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION. PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR PRIMARY, SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION PUPILS. PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR THE OTHER ARTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROADWAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Morris Road
Broadway
WR12 7RD
- Phone:
- 01386858672
- Email:
- kbkbeasley@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window