Accounts and annual returns JOHN MARTIN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 527473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window