Financial history JOHN MARTIN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 527473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £808.55k £854.18k £799.90k £832.35k £684.58k
Total expenditure £820.82k £805.81k £887.07k £847.20k £655.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.45k £486 £505 £150 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £807.09k £853.69k £799.40k £832.20k £679.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.49k
Income - Legacies £1.45k £486 £275 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £790.33k £770.28k £833.15k £790.47k £603.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.49k £35.53k £53.93k £56.73k £52.02k
Expenditure - Governance £15.55k £15.34k £16.33k £15.31k £16.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £253.65k £239.98k £293.08k £247.80k £198.94k
Expenditure - Investment management £30.49k £35.53k £53.93k £56.73k £52.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0