Trustees JOHN MARTIN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 527473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Westlake Chair 25 March 2019
OURSIDE YOUTH ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sherraden Adelle Murphy Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
JOHN HYDE SMITH OBE Trustee 14 April 2020
None on record
Alan Albert Patrick Booth Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Philip William Airdrie Trustee 15 November 2018
GIBBS
Received: On time
JOSEPH WRIGHT'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Janet Ellis Osborne Trustee 15 November 2018
None on record
JOHN WILSON Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
Stuart Allerton Trustee 09 March 2017
EVESHAM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Valerie Butler Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
Cyril Clayton Scorse Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Rev MARK BINNEY Trustee 13 March 2008
GREAT AND LITTLE HAMPTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, BENGEWORTH
Received: On time
EVESHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time