Accounts and annual returns OLD FREE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527497
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 October 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 December 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 November 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required