JAMES PARKER BUCKS BEQUEST FOR SUNDAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 527659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the Sunday School at the Priory Church, Deeping St James, Lincolnshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £81
Total expenditure: £81

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Elizabeth Harrison Trustee 28 April 2024
THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND WILLIAM HENRY COOPER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING ST JAMES
Recently registered
Janet Mary Fisk Trustee 16 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING ST JAMES
Recently registered
THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND WILLIAM HENRY COOPER
Received: On time
Rev Mark Williams Trustee 11 October 2020
THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND WILLIAM HENRY COOPER
Received: On time
Simon Edmund Marshall Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING ST JAMES
Recently registered
THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND WILLIAM HENRY COOPER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £74 £78 £84 £82 £81
Total expenditure £74 £78 £278 £20 £81
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
135C EASTGATE
DEEPING ST. JAMES
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 8RB
Phone:
01778346420
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available