Pike and Eure and George Walker Educational Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Foundation is to provide financial assistance to young people who live in Washingborough and Heighington, Lincolnshire, and who in the opinion of its Trustees are in need of help in order to undertake courses at college, university or join apprenticeship schemes. For example, help towards the purchase of tools or books and also sporting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 March 1965: Standard registration
- THE PIKE AND EURE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH TERENCE GIBBON | Chair |
|
||||||
David TRAFFORD | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian DODGE | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Jane BRISCOE | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
LYNDA SIMONS | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RONALD OXBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLINE JANE DUNNING | Trustee |
|
||||||
GWENDOLINE ELIZABETH BLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE GILLIAN HUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JAMES HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.91k | £9.99k | £10.26k | £10.58k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.73k | £4.82k | £6.36k | £17.84k | £7.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1954 as amended on 13 Aug 2020 as amended on 13 Aug 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS FOR THE BENEFIT OF NEEDY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE TWO PARISHES:- EVENING OR OTHER CLASSES, GYMNASIUM LIBRARY OR READING ROOM, EXHIBITIONS, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR OTHERWISE THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WASHINGBOROUGH AND HEIGHINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Leicester Close
Washingborough
LINCOLN
LN4 1DS
- Phone:
- 01522791030
- Email:
- anne318sutton@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window