THE SUTTON ST JAMES' FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATION AND THE POOR

Charity number: 527757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required