Accounts and annual returns KING EDWARD VI GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 528254
Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 755 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 755 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 October 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required