Financial history KING EDWARD VI GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 528254
Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £18.23k £85.44k £34.88k £22.31k £24.64k
Total expenditure £17.62k £14.77k £15.61k £15.43k £13.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A