Accounts and annual returns LILLEY AND STONE SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 528255
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required