Financial history LILLEY AND STONE SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 528255
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.66k £29.81k £49.17k £39.23k £32.21k
Total expenditure £27.61k £54.49k £49.15k £35.55k £16.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A