JOHN DARELL FOR SCHOLARSHIP AT EXETER COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual scholarship awards are available for students from Lincolnshire and/or Nottinghamshire, admitted to Exeter College, Oxford. Applications for financial assistance (an award) should be made to the charity through the Rector's and Tutors Committee of Exeter College, Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 May 1964: Standard registration
- DARREL SCHOLARSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Canon Nicholas James Watson Brown | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.31k | £29.31k | £31.59k | £27.38k | £35.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.60k | £5.47k | £7.72k | £9.47k | £13.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1664.
Charitable objects
A SUITABLE SCHOLAR TO BE CHOSEN OUT OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, ALTERNATIVELY, TO BE EDUCATED AND ADMITTED IN EXETER COLLEGE, OXFORD.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY HOSPITAL ESTATES
Newcastle House
37 Bridgegate
Retford
Nottinghamshire
DN22 7UX
- Phone:
- 01777703718
- Email:
- admin@trinity-estates.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window