WILLIAM NORTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Shropshire
Governance
- 25 May 1964: Standard registration
- 18 February 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NORTON TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75 | £0 | £144 | £46 | |
|
Total expenditure | £85 | £0 | £36 | £39 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 06 February 2008 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 04 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 11 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1905
Charitable objects
1. AWARDING EXHIBITIONS TO BOYS AND GIRLS FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION HIGHER THAN ELEMENTARY. 2. PROVIDING BOOKS FOR A SCHOOL LIBRARY. 3. AWARDING PRIZES TO BOYS AND GIRLS ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ONIBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window