THE CRIPPS HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support existing and past members of Cripps Hall of Residence (University of Nottingham) through the provision of travel scholarships to encourage personal development and benefits to the wider community, discretionary grants for additional Hall facilities and support for cases of individual hardship, and on-going membership / communication services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CHARLES WINTERTON | Chair | 29 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Charles Moore Wilson | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robert Ware | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £996 | £1.03k | £2.51k | £3.51k | £7.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £1.15k | £2.86k | £2.43k | £2.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JANUARY 1973
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION IN WHOLE OR PART OF BUILDINGS EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES IN ADDITION TO OR IN REPLACEMENT FOR CRIPPS HALL (B) THE PROVISION OF TRAVEL OR OTHER SCHOLARSHIP AWARDS OR GRANTS TO ANY PERSON WHO WAS OR IS A STUDENT RESIDENT AT CRIPPS HALL FOR AT LEAST ONE UNIVERSITY TERM. (C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ACTIVITIES OF ACADEMIC OR RECREATIONAL CHARACTER FOR THE PERSONS REFERRED TO IN (B). (D) THE RELIEF OF ANY NECESSITOUS PERSON WHO IS OR WAS A STUDENT OR TEACHER RESIDENT AT CRIPPS HALL OR WHO WAS OTHERWISE EMPLOYED THERE. (E) THE RELIEF OF ANY NECESSITOUS PERSON WHO IS THE WIFE OR HUSBAND OR WIDOW OR WODOWER OR CHILD OR DEPENDANT OF ANY SUCH PERSON AS IS MENTIONED IN (D). (F) THE EDUCATION OF ANY NECESSITOUS CHILD, OR DEPENDANT OF ANY SUCH PERSON MENTIONED IN (D). (G) THE EDUCATION OF ANY NECESSITOUS PERSON WHO IS SUCH A PERSON AS IS MENTIONED IN (D).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Portley Wood Road
WHYTELEAFE
CR3 0BP
- Phone:
- 07802731331
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window