BROOKE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 14 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required