ADAMS FOUNDATION, WEM, TRUST

Charity number: 528403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 July 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required