ADCOTE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 528407
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 499 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 499 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1045 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1045 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1410 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1410 days
Annual return 31 August 2015 13 March 2017 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 30 March 2017 273 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 21 July 2015 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 02 June 2015 On time