ADCOTE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 528407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £1.64m £1.66m £1.87m £2.13m £3.88m
Total expenditure £1.98m £1.86m £1.83m £2.29m £5.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.85k £4.93k £673 £2.86k £3.15k
Income - Other trading activities £21.46k £30.90k £59.17k £41.65k £21.90k
Income - Charitable activities £1.62m £1.62m £1.81m £2.08m £3.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £381 £3.88k £7.10k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.70m £1.70m £2.11m £4.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £62.26k £50.46k £41.97k £95.91k £105.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.21m