MORETON HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 528409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.01m £9.66m £11.34m £10.52m £9.22m
Total expenditure £8.83m £9.28m £10.23m £10.20m £9.35m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £63.80k £92.83k £832.75k £110.70k £23.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £30.94k £34.28k £18.97k
Income - Charitable activities £8.92m £9.57m £10.47m £10.33m £8.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £560 £800 £793 £722 £1.74k
Income - Other £30.74k £2.77k £6.88k £50.00k £696.46k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.80m £9.25m £10.14m £10.15m £9.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.71k £31.95k £65.39k £43.26k £40.83k
Expenditure - Governance £57.97k £68.73k £68.73k £32.86k £82.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £30.06k £0 £18.92k