MORETON HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 528409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annabel Gillian Foulger Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
Eithne Josephine Flynn Trustee 28 March 2014 None on record
Dr JEREMY JOHN DIXEY Trustee 15 December 2015 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET TUNSTALL Trustee None on record
LAURA VIRGINIA YULE Trustee 14 January 2013 None on record
Carol Angela Jones Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
Anthony Leonard Stockdale Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
Richard James Carryer Trustee 29 November 2021 None on record
MRS KATIE NEILSON Trustee None on record
MR MARTYN HEATH Trustee None on record
Susan Elizabeth Hincks Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record