Accounts and annual returns SHREWSBURY SCHOOL

Charity number: 528413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 12 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 09 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 09 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window