Trustees SHREWSBURY SCHOOL

Charity number: 528413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr T Haynes Chair 01 September 2010
ST PAUL'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
HUGH NETTLEFOLD TRUST
Received: On time
SKINNERS' EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Recently registered
JONATHAN LEIGH Trustee 03 October 2022
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
William Kenyon Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Sara Louise Hankin Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Councillor Daniel Orland Morris Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
DAVID ROBERT STACEY Trustee 01 January 2020
DR GARDNER'S CHARITY FOR NURSES
Received: On time
THOMPSON PRITCHARD TRUST
Received: On time
THE SHROPSHIRE WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
Fiona Lindsay Schofield Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Saskia Jones-Perrott Trustee 31 August 2019
None on record
James Pitt Trustee 01 January 2019
SHREWSBURY SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Grainne Walters Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
Mr D Chance Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Mr R Boys-Stones Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
Mr M Moir Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Councillor C Motley Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Diana Flint Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Mrs C Howarth Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Professor A McCarthy Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Mr J Clark Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record