Trustees ROBERT SCHOLEFIELD MILNER BEQUEST FOR GENERAL EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
Charity number: 528628
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ANN LOVATT | Chair |
|
||||||
Gareth Graham | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stuart Warrington | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE QUINN | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DWYER | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|||||
PENNY HALL | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS VICKI WOOLACROFT | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.