Accounts and annual returns MARY DORMER HARRIS BURSARY

Charity number: 528762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 31 December 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required