Financial history MARY DORMER HARRIS BURSARY

Charity number: 528762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £14 £13 £0 £6 £1
Total expenditure £750 £1.07k £1.10k £725 £650
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A