Trustees LAWRENCE SHERIFF SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 528770

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Canale-Parola | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kulasekar Godavathi Krishnama | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clinton Drackett | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Stuart Nigel Esworthy | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Legge | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mpofu | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lau | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kalonga Musukuma | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Baran | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
CAROL ANNE MOOR | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUSTIN MUSTON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lynne Eastwood | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rees | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA WHITFIELD | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Barnett | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.