THE PERCIVAL GUILDHOUSE

Charity number: 528782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 15 February 2017 On time Download