THE PERCIVAL GUILDHOUSE

Charity number: 528782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID THOMSON Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
PETER STEPHEN REANEY Trustee 08 October 2015
THE HILLSIDE AND ROKEBY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Overdue by 39 days
THE WESTHAM HOUSE FUND Received: On time
Rob Close Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
Clare Turnbull Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Stephen Becker Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Carin Jackson Trustee 18 January 2018 None on record
DAVID DOVE Chair
THE WESTHAM HOUSE FUND Received: On time
Ralph De La Croix Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Anda Drasovean Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record