THE BOB GERRARD MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of foreign and national travel for students from disadvantaged backgrounds. To enable a rounded experience of heritage, culture and British values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Walsall
Governance
- 27 March 1961: Standard registration
- 01 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £1.58k | £1.60k | £1.54k | £1.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 January 2019 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 November 2017 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 December 2016 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JANUARY 1961
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF GRANTS OR PRIZES TO CHILDREN WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE ATTENDED THE WILLENHALL COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL TO ENABLE THEM TO ENRICH THEIR EDUCATIONAL EXPERIENCE BY TRAVEL ABROAD OR BY A PERIOD OF STUDY AT AN OVERSEAS EDUCATIONAL CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WILLENHALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window